This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 18:31:40 (UTC).

Moreland OB Gyn & Associates, S.C. vs. Buck A Konkol et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Moreland OB Gyn Associates, S C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Buck A Konkol. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0826

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moreland OB Gyn & Associates, S.C.

1111 Delafield, Suite 311

Waukesha, WI 53188

Defendants

Konkol, Buck A

Waukesha, WI 53186

Konkel, Linsey R

Waukesha, WI 53186

Garnishee

UPS

636 E. Sandy Lake Road

Coppell, TX 75019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peterson, Christina L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 029556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Filed on Buck A. Konkol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015288, Payable Number: 434806, Receipt Number: 21R 016538, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015288, Payable Number: 434806, Receipt Number: 21R 016538, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC000826; Caption: Moreland OB Gyn & Associates, S.C. vs. Buck A Konkol et al; Total Amount: $1339.79; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Buck A Konkol; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 436 Dunbar Avenue, Waukesha, WI 53186 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Linsey R Konkel; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 436 Dunbar Avenue, Waukesha, WI 53186 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Moreland OB Gyn & Associates, S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1111 Delafield, Suite 311, Waukesha, WI 53188 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1011.29; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $59.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-07-12; Type: Full satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015150, Payable Number: 434683, Receipt Number: 21R 016383, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Service: Attempted service of an Authenticated Summons and Complaint as to the defendant, Buck A. Konkol.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009389, Payable Number: 431543, Receipt Number: 21R 010410, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Buck A. Konkol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Linsey R. Konkol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 1,011.29 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Buck Konkol and Linsey Konkel Service as to: All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $24.00/$35.00/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Christina L.