This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 03:06:30 (UTC).

MONROE CLINIC vs. SABRYNA M GRAVES

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 MONROE CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SABRYNA M GRAVES. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Vale, Thomas J and Bawinkel, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0496

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Vale, Thomas J

Bawinkel, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROE CLINIC

Sauk Rapids, MN 56739

Defendant

GRAVES, SABRYNA M

Monroe, WI 53566

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee, Teng Wang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005595, Payable Number: 88809, Receipt Number: 21R 008580, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000496; Caption: MONROE CLINIC vs. SABRYNA M GRAVES; Total Amount: $1920.2; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: SABRYNA M GRAVES; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 632 17TH AVE, Monroe, WI 53566 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MONROE CLINIC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 N Benton Dr #209, Sauk Rapids, MN 56739 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1798.7; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Court Reporter: Severson, Denise; Additional Text: Defendant SABRYNA M GRAVES appeared by video means. Attorney Janna Kern appeared by video means for Plaintiff MONROE CLINIC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bawinkel, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Court Reporter: Severson, Denise; Additional Text: 10:40 AM Defendant SABRYNA M GRAVES appeared by video means. Attorney Teng Wang Lee appeared by video means for Plaintiff MONROE CLINIC. Adjourned return date scheduled for December 20, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on December 20, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004910, Payable Number: 88179, Receipt Number: 21R 007567, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 22, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Teng Wang