This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 03:06:22 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. MELISSA A PETERS AKA MELISSA A HOLUB

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MELISSA A PETERS AKA MELISSA A HOLUB. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Theresa M and Pouros, James G. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0029

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Theresa M

Pouros, James G

 

Party Details

Defendants

PETERS, MELISSA A

Hartford, WI 53027

Holub, Melissa A

Hartford, WI 53027

Not Yet Classified

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Garnishees

Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford, A

105 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Steel-Craft Corp of Hartford, B

105 Steel Craft Dr

Hartford, WI 53027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Smith, Nicholas A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for PETERS, MELISSA A; Additional Text: Amended - "B"; Garnishee: Steel-Craft Corp of Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Additional Text: Amending Caption; Melissa A Peters is amended to Melissa A Peters AKA Melissa A Holub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter received from Kohn Law Firm dated 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion & Motion to Amend Caption, filed by Atty R Duffy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: on 1/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Additional Text: Order Amending Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for PETERS, MELISSA A; Additional Text: "B" Garnishee: Steel-Craft Corp of Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 192286, Payable Number: 161512, Receipt Number: 21R 022566, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 192286, Payable Number: 161512, Receipt Number: 21R 022566, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for PETERS, MELISSA A; Additional Text: "A" garnishee: Steel-Craft Corp. of Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097050, Payable Number: 156826, Receipt Number: 21R 011906, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $210.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097050, Payable Number: 156826, Receipt Number: 21R 011906, Amount: $210.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Transcript of Judgment; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2021TJ000029; Caption: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. MELISSA A PETERS AKA MELISSA A HOLUB; Total Amount: $11707.86; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Original judgment entered 11-21-2016 and docketed on 12-07-2016 in Dodge County, case # 2016CV000472; Judgment Party; Party Name: MELISSA A PETERS; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 419 GRANT ST, Hartford, WI 53027 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 350 CAMINO DE LA REINA SUITE 100, San Diego, CA 92108 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $11707.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment filed; Additional Text: from Dodge County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $10.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 078833, Payable Number: 156425, Receipt Number: 21R 011188, Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Nicholas A.