This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 21:37:31 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Kate Reilly

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Midland Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kate Reilly. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2091

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Reilly, Kate

Evansville, WI 53536

Garnishee

Kroger

1014 Vine Street, Attention Payroll

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Debtor: Kate Reilly, Garnishee: Kroger, Creditor: Midland Funding LLC, Unpaid Amount: $1350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 086574, Payable Number: 261314, Receipt Number: 22R 002582, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 086574, Payable Number: 261314, Receipt Number: 22R 002582, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Debtor: Kate Reilly, Garnishee: Kroger, Creditor: Midland Funding LLC, Unpaid Amount: $1,201.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 665467, Payable Number: 254797, Receipt Number: 21R 030176, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 665467, Payable Number: 254797, Receipt Number: 21R 030176, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 665390, Payable Number: 254730, Receipt Number: 21R 030036, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 10:10 AM Attorney James Kachelski for Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video means for Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC. Defendant Kate Reilly not in court. Judgment for Plaintiff, money: $1085.09 plus costs, attorney's fees waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Activity: Return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on September 15, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Kate Reilly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for money $1,085.09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 662375, Payable Number: 252802, Receipt Number: 21R 026396, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Plaintiff's documents: Amazon.com Account statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Kate Reilly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J