This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 19:38:53 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, INC vs. MARCY RASPBERRY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Midland Credit Management, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARCY RASPBERRY. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Waterman, R. Michael and Heckmann, Timothy C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0410

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Waterman, R. Michael

Heckmann, Timothy C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, INC

350 Camino De La Reina, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

RASPBERRY, MARCY

Hudson, WI 54016

Garnishee

Kwik Trip, Inc.

1626 Oak St

La Crosse, WI 54603-2308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: GD: Kwik Trip, Inc. Filed by Atty Hermersmann. Sealed copies electronically to Atty. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 053777, Payable Number: 230036, Receipt Number: 21R 008088, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 053777, Payable Number: 230036, Receipt Number: 21R 008088, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 053521, Payable Number: 229828, Receipt Number: 21R 007825, Amount: $5.00 Filed by Atty. Hermersmann. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ST CROIX; Case number: 2021SC000410; Caption: Midland Credit Management, INC vs. MARCY RASPBERRY; Total Amount: $780.39; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: MARCY RASPBERRY; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 704 8TH ST N #3, Hudson, WI 54016 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Midland Credit Management, INC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 350 Camino DE LA Reina, Suite 100, San Diego, CA 92108 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $546.39; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Garnishment costs; Amount: $112.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 03:11 PM CO: Timothy C. Heckmann, Clerk: K Kittel. Attorney Ryan Duffy appeared by video means for Plaintiff Midland Credit Management, INC. Defendant MARCY RASPBERRY not in court. Plaintiff requests default JMT: Wavies Atty Fees. Crt grants JMT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: WAIVING Atty Fees, filed by Atty Hermersmann. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: Service of Summons and Complaint by regular mail. Filed by the PL. ec: PL, c: DE w/zoom info. kak ($546.39)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: for Marcy Raspberry filed by Atty Hermersmann. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 032618, Payable Number: 228473, Receipt Number: 21R 005791, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald