This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 20:37:59 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc vs. Jennifer Olmedo

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Olmedo. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Beer, James R and Schubert, Robin M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0340

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Beer, James R

Schubert, Robin M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Olmedo, Jennifer

Brodhead, WI 53520-0353

Garnishee

US Dept of Veterans Affairs Office of Financial System

810 Vermont Ave Nw Room 471, Attn: Payroll

Washington, DC 20420

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for Midland Credit Management, IncOlmedo, JenniferUS Dept of Veterans Affairs Office of Financial System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003348, Payable Number: 86864, Receipt Number: 21R 005374, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003348, Payable Number: 86864, Receipt Number: 21R 005374, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003334, Payable Number: 86856, Receipt Number: 21R 005350, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000340; Caption: Midland Credit Management, Inc vs. Jennifer Olmedo; Total Amount: $1399.75; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jennifer Olmedo; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 353 1308 13th St, Brodhead, WI 53520-0353 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Midland Credit Management, Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1278.25; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Beer, James R.; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: 10:00 AM Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video means for Plaintiff Midland Credit Management, Inc. Defendant Jennifer Olmedo not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Beer, James R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schubert, Robin M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Beer, James R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 19, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002939, Payable Number: 86549, Receipt Number: 21R 004817, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J