This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 00:42:34 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc vs. Christopher R Price

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher R Price. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Novak, Nathan E and Schaffer, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Novak, Nathan E

Schaffer, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

350 Camino De La Reina, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Midland Credit Management, Inc

350 Camino De La Reina, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

PRICE, CHRISTOPHER R

Osseo, WI 54758

Garnishee

Lake Region Enterprises, Inc.

13296 County Hwy Oo

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Earnings Garnishment Notice filed. Garnishee: Lake Region Enterprises, Inc. Debtor: Christopher R. Price Other: Sealed forms provided to Atty. for plt electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 283293, Payable Number: 260379, Receipt Number: 21R 020647, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 283293, Payable Number: 260379, Receipt Number: 21R 020647, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 249171, Payable Number: 260259, Receipt Number: 21R 020367, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Schaffer, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: EAU CLAIRE; Case number: 2021SC000080; Caption: Midland Credit Management, Inc vs. Christopher R Price; Total Amount: $562.6; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Midland Credit Management, Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 350 CAMINO DE LA REINA, SUITE 100, San Diego, CA 92108 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Christopher R Price; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: S14750 US HIGHWAY 53, Osseo, WI 54758 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $441.1; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Aff. of Noncompliance/Order for Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after motion; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Aff. of noncompliance/prop. order for money jdgmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Amount: $1556.46; Additional Text: $2.00 mail fee provided for defendant(s), mailed defendant's copies on 01/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties with instructions for remote appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000712, Payable Number: 252705, Receipt Number: 21R 001439, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald