This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 00:44:18 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. ANGELA L SKILES

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELA L SKILES. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kujak, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kujak, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

350 Camino De La Reina, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

SKILES, ANGELA L

Camp Douglas, WI 54618

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lower, Austin J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 019616, Payable Number: 125163, Receipt Number: 21R 001395, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000070; Caption: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. ANGELA L SKILES; Total Amount: $727.82; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANGELA L SKILES; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 104 NELSON VALLEY RD, Camp Douglas, WI 54618 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 350 CAMINO DE LA REINA, SUITE 100, San Diego, CA 92108 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $606.32; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: 02:42 PM Attorney Austin J Lower in court by letter for Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. Defendant ANGELA L SKILES not in court. COURT: Default Judgment plus statutory costs were granted to Plaintiff against Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: PLAINTIFF WAIVES ATTORNEY FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 15, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 1-20-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Atty Lower

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009626, Payable Number: 124688, Receipt Number: 21R 000526, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY LOWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: ANGELA L SKILES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J