This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:33:19 (UTC).

Michelle Fitzgerald vs. James M. Hawley

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Michelle Fitzgerald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against James M Hawley. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Voigt, W. Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0035

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Voigt, W. Andrew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fitzgerald, Michelle

Lodi, WI 53555

Defendants

Hawley, James M.

Pardeeville, WI 53954

ABC Insurance Company

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nugent, Gina D

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Karl A

Bandt, Christopher Robert

Krueger, Beau

Ways, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter agreed to stay any further discovery pending motion filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Co filed by Atty Christopher Bandt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007631, Payable Number: 162412, Receipt Number: 21R 012962, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Attorney Nicole Ways appearing on behalf of defendant, Auto Owner's Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Defendant Owner's Insurance Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint and Cross-Claim Against Defendant James M. Hawley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Brief in support of motion; Additional Text: Defendant Owners Insurance Company's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Bifurcate and Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Of Nicole M. Ways In Support of Motion to Bifurcate and Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: And Motion to Bifurcate and Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew; Additional Text: For Change of Party Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Atty Nicole Ways - Atty for Defendant Owners Insurance Received Second Amended Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: For Change of Party Name

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003665, Payable Number: 158730, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: filed by Atty. Karl Green on behalf of Defendant, James M. Hawley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 3/28/21 James Hawley was personally served the Summons and Complaint and the Amended Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: w/ attached Exhibit 1 - Attachment A: CDBG Program General Conditions, Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, Exhibit 4 - Contractor's Payment Request No. 1, Exhibit 5 - Contractor's Payment Request No. 2, Exhibit 6 - Contractor's Payment Request dated 9-24-18, Exhibit 7 - Contractor's Payment Request dated 11-1-18, Exhibit 8 - Badger Basement Systems, Inc. Project Summary, Exhibit 9 - Letter to Above All Building and Remodeling dated 4/15/2020, Exhibit 10 - Letter from James Hawley, Exhibit 11 - Letter to Above All Building and Remodeling dated May 22, 2020 & Exhibit 12 - Project Bid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: w/ attached Exhibit 1 - CDBG Program General Conditions, Exhibit 2 - Mortgage, Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, Exhibit 4 - Contractor's Payment Request No. 1, Exhibit 5 - Contractor's Payment Request No. 2. Exhibit 6 - Contractor's Payment Request dated 9-24-18, Exhibit 7 - Contractor's Payment Request dated 11-1-18, Exhibit 8 - Notice of Claim, Exhibit 9 - Letter from James Hawley, Exhibit 10 - Notice of Claim, Exhibit 11 - Project Bid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001300, Payable Number: 156559, Receipt Number: 21R 002114, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Karl A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ways, Nicole M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krueger, Beau

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bandt, Christopher Robert