This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 16:06:35 (UTC).

Michael A. Colon vs. Peter D. Hehli et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Michael A Colon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Peter D Hehli. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McGinnis, Mark J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0721

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McGinnis, Mark J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Colon, Michael A.

Appleton, WI 54911

Defendants

Hehli, Peter D.

Greenville, WI 54942

Progressive Insurance

P.O. Box 2930

Clintonclinton, IA 52733

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Johnson, Steven Daniel

Defendant Attorney

Hagen, Kristin M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: McGinnis, Mark J; Court Reporter: Zeegers, Taylor; Additional Text: Court will wait 120 days to set hearing after the answer is filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: and Answer to Cross-Claims - filed by Atty Kristin Hagen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on October 25, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: for Hearing to Be Scheduled Remotely During COVID-19 Pandemic; filed by Atty. Steven Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Judge Mark McGinnis from Atty. Kristin Hagen dated 10-18-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 364668, Payable Number: 405145, Receipt Number: 21R 261748, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Atty Kristin Hagen appears for Peter D. Hehli and Progressive Insurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons; Additional Text: filed by Atty. Steven Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed; Additional Text: filed by Atty. Johnson (NOTE: summons will be filed under separate filing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 325734, Payable Number: 404369, Receipt Number: 21R 260473, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hagen, Kristin M.