This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 14:07:50 (UTC).

Merwin Oil Company vs. Justin McDaniel

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Merwin Oil Company filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Justin McDaniel. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Muehlbauer, James K and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0550

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Muehlbauer, James K

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merwin Oil Company

Po Box 68

Fond Du Lac, WI 54936

Defendant

McDaniel, Justin

West Bend, WI 53090

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 116346, Payable Number: 157807, Receipt Number: 21R 014237, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2021SC000550; Caption: Merwin Oil Company vs. Justin McDaniel; Total Amount: $6459.66; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Justin McDaniel; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 8294 Orchard Valley Rd, West Bend, WI 53090 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Merwin Oil Company; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 68, Fond du Lac, WI 54936 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6250.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M; Additional Text: No appearance by defendant; default judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $6,250.16, plus costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: of auth'd Amended Summons & Complaint upon JUSTIN McDANIEL on 6/21/21 with copy of same attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097322, Payable Number: 156950, Receipt Number: 21R 012238, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance of filing agent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance of filing agent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Amount: $6250.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Supporting Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $6250.16; Additional Text: Return Date: 6/14/21 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 078470, Payable Number: 156161, Receipt Number: 21R 010709, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less