This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 16:20:48 (UTC).

Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region...et al vs. Michael J Ary

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael J Ary. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Raihle, David, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0166

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Raihle, David, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc.

1400 Bellinger Street

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Mayo Clinic Health System-Chippewa Valley

Bloomer, WI 54724

Defendant

Ary, Michael J

Marinette, WI 54143-3915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henkel, Timothy J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended; Additional Text: Order for Dismissal - Non-Eviction (Small Claims) - copies to parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Amended Order - Sent for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Sent for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on March 29, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ary, Michael J; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Michael J Ary - Summons and Complaint and EF Notice - NOTE: Plaintiff to notify Clerk how to proceed as DE's address is out of county Current: 1122 Cleveland Ave, Marinette, WI 54143-3915 United States (Effective: 03-11-2021) Prior: 529 East Murray Street, Boyd, WI 54726 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr; Additional Text: Regular mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 045516, Payable Number: 152774, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Chippewa County Small Claims Rules attached to Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Bill of costs

    Read MoreRead Less