This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 03:04:59 (UTC).

Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region...et al vs. Genna Diane Khardian

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Genna Diane Khardian. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Boyle, Maureen D, Amy Pavick and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0296

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Boyle, Maureen D

Amy Pavick

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc.

1400 Bellinger Street

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Mayo Clinic Health System-Northland

Barron, WI 54812

Defendant

Khardian, Genna Diane

Barron, WI 54812

Garnishee

McCain Foods USA

1 Tower Lane 11Th Floor

Oakbrook Terrace, IL 60181

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henkel, Timothy J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 042552, Payable Number: 121917, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 042552, Payable Number: 121917, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 042319, Payable Number: 121765, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 042320, Payable Number: 121765, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000296; Caption: Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region...et al vs. Genna Diane Khardian; Total Amount: $923.45; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: 05/24/2021 THIS JUDGMENT IS AMENDED TO REFLECT JUDGMENT IN AMOUNT OF $918.45; Judgment Party; Party Name: Genna Diane Khardian; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 143 E Wisconsin Avenue, Barron, WI 54812 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1400 Bellinger Street, Eau Claire, WI 54703 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $57.25; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $1.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $785.2; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000296; Caption: Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region...et al vs. Genna Diane Khardian; Total Amount: $7234.15; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Genna Diane Khardian; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 143 E Wisconsin Avenue, Barron, WI 54812 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Genna Diane Khardian; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 143 E Wisconsin Avenue, Barron, WI 54812 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mayo Clinic Health System-Northland; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1222 East Woodland Avenue, Barron, WI 54812 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $7095.9; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $57.25; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $1.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Malsom, Kathy A; Additional Text: 03:58 PM Plaintiff Mayo Clinic Health System-Northwest Wisconsin Region, Inc. and Attorney Timothy J Henkel not in court. Plaintiff Mayo Clinic Health System-Northland and Attorney Timothy J Henkel not in court. Defendant Genna Diane Khardian not in court. Judgments to be entered per bill of costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 025819, Payable Number: 121086, Receipt Number: 21RP001006, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Bill of costs; Additional Text: unsigned

    Read MoreRead Less