This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:26:03 (UTC).

Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare vs. Todd & Holly Randall

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Todd Holly Randall. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Gonzalez, Ramona A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0360

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Gonzalez, Ramona A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare

La Crosse, WI 54601

Defendants

Randall, Todd Michael

West Salem, WI 54669

Randall, Holly Leona

West Salem, WI 54669

Garnishee

LKQ Corporation

500 W Madison St. Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60661

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henkel, Timothy J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee: LKQ Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008499, Payable Number: 186836, Receipt Number: 21R 013740, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $210.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008499, Payable Number: 186836, Receipt Number: 21R 013740, Amount: $210.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021CV000360; Caption: Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare vs. Todd & Holly Randall; Total Amount: $27935.71; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 700 West Avenue South, La Crosse, WI 54601 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Holly Leona Randall; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 340 Lincoln Avenue N, West Salem, WI 54669 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Todd Michael Randall; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 340 Lincoln Avenue N, West Salem, WI 54669 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $27470.21; Costs/Amount; Description: Costs and Disbursements; Amount: $460.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment/judgment; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008298, Payable Number: 186692, Receipt Number: 21R 013516, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion; Additional Text: for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Personal Service for Todd Randall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Personal Service for Holly Randall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005990, Payable Number: 184827, Receipt Number: 21R 010123, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less