This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:25:57 (UTC).

Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare vs. Tina M. Karaffa

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tina M Karaffa. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Gonzalez, Ramona A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0361

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Gonzalez, Ramona A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayo Clinic Health System-Franciscan Healthcare

La Crosse, WI 54601

Defendant

Karaffa, Tina M.

La Crosse, WI 54603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henkel, Timothy J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.; Additional Text: Proposed Order for Dismissal without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.; Additional Text: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Gonzalez, Ramona A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005991, Payable Number: 184827, Receipt Number: 21R 010123, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less