This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 12:42:32 (UTC).

Mary K Klund et al vs. Country Preferred Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Mary K Klund filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Country Preferred Insurance Company. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dillon, Daniel T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0797

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dillon, Daniel T

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Klund, Mary K

Brantwood, WI 54513

Klund, Steven L

Brantwood, WI 54513

Defendants

Country Preferred Insurance Company

1701 N. Towanda Avenue

Bloomington, IL 61710

Purdy, Ashley N

Milton, WI 53563

Not Yet Classified

Dean Health Plan Inc

1277 Deming Way

Madison, WI 53717

American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

6000 American Parkway

Madison, WI 53783

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caya, Steven T.

Dykstra, Emily A.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Conlin, Shannon Ashley

Mundt, Rick J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer to crossclaim; Additional Text: Plaintiffs Answer to Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc Cross-Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 950731, Payable Number: 259715, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Involuntary Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI: Attorney Rick J Mundt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim and cross claim; Additional Text: Involuntary Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 950181, Payable Number: 259316, Receipt Number: 21R 037942, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Attorney Shannon A Conlin retained by Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim and cross claim; Additional Text: by Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to Steve Karis, Customer Service, authorized on behalf of Involuntary Plaintiff Dean Health Plan on December 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to John Long, Clerk, authorized on behalf of Involuntary Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to John Long, Clerk, authorized on behalf of Defendant County Preferred Insurance Company on December 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice was served to Defendant Ashley N Purdy on December 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 865081, Payable Number: 257970, Receipt Number: 21R 035946, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conlin, Shannon Ashley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mundt, Rick J.