This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 13:27:15 (UTC).

Mark E. Hull vs. Town of Wausau et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Mark E Hull filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against Town of Wausau. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are O'Neill, Suzanne C and Maxson, Denise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0332

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

O'Neill, Suzanne C

Maxson, Denise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hull, Mark E.

Wausau, WI 54403

Defendants

Town of Wausau

Wausau, WI 54403

Worden Enterprises LLC

222755 Hines Road

Ringle, WI 54471

WRJ Properties LLC

222755 Hines Road

Ringle, WI 54471

Worden, Randy J.

Ringle, WI 54471

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yde, Matthew E

Defendant Attorneys

Vanderwaal, Shane Jon

Scheller, Arthur M., III

Scheller, Arthur M, III

Turonie, Lee D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: O'Neill, Suzanne C.; Location: BRANCH 1 COURTROOM - SECOND FLOOR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Maxson, Denise; Additional Text: STC 5/2/2022 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on May 2, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on November 9, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: O'Neill, Suzanne C.; Additional Text: Orders on Motions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Defendant's Proposed Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Party dismissed for Town of Wausau; Court Official: O'Neill, Suzanne C.; Additional Text: Town of Wausau per Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter by Attorney S. VanderWaal Regarding Objection to Proposed Findings of Fact and Orders on Motions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097438, Payable Number: 264565, Receipt Number: 21R 003375P, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: by Atty Lee Turonie for Worden Enterprises LLC, WRJ Properties LLC and Randy J Worden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Lee D Turonie in Support of Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Objection to motion; Additional Text: Objection to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Defendant Town of Wausau's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Brief in support of motion; Additional Text: Defendant Town of Wausau's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: with Exhibit A-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 097244, Payable Number: 264447, Receipt Number: 21R 003293P, Amount: $184.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turonie, Lee D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanderwaal, Shane Jon