This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 08:55:23 (UTC).

Mariner Finance, LLC vs. SKYLER PUTMAN

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Mariner Finance, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKYLER PUTMAN. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kujak, Angela and Lowe, Lori J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0279

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kujak, Angela

Lowe, Lori J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariner Finance, LLC

6771 University Avenue Suite 104

Middleton, WI 53562

Defendant

PUTMAN, SKYLER

Lyndon Station, WI 53944

Garnishee

LAKESHORE RECYCLING SYSTEMS, LLC

6132 Oakton Street

Morton Grove, IL 60053

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duppler, Cynthia A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for PUTMAN, SKYLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 098079, Payable Number: 128896, Receipt Number: 21R 008076, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 098079, Payable Number: 128896, Receipt Number: 21R 008076, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 049278, Payable Number: 126701, Receipt Number: 21R 004462, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Lowe, Lori J.; Additional Text: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000279; Caption: Mariner Finance, LLC vs. SKYLER PUTMAN; Total Amount: $1359.39; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: SKYLER PUTMAN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W2162 AMHERST DR, Lyndon Station, WI 53944 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mariner Finance, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6771 University Avenue Suite 104, Middleton, WI 53562 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1092.89; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-06-08; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: 02:17 PM Attorney Cynthia A Duppler in court by letter for Plaintiff Mariner Finance, LLC. Defendant SKYLER PUTMAN not in court. COURT: Default Judgment plus statutory costs/attorney fees were granted to Plaintiff against Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 5-10-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Atty Duppler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 039454, Payable Number: 126245, Receipt Number: 21R 003574, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY DUPPLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: SKYLER PUTMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duppler, Cynthia A