This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 01:46:39 (UTC).

Mariner Finance, LLC vs. MONICA MILAN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Mariner Finance, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONICA MILAN. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Budiac, Maureen Roberts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2314

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Budiac, Maureen Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariner Finance, LLC

W3169 Van Roy Road Suite 11

Appleton, WI 54915

Defendant

MILAN, MONICA

Plover, WI 54467

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 365329, Payable Number: 405679, Receipt Number: 21R 262738, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: OUTAGAMIE; Case number: 2021SC002314; Caption: Mariner Finance, LLC vs. MONICA MILAN; Total Amount: $4252.67; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: MONICA MILAN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2000 PORTER RD APT 8, Plover, WI 54467 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mariner Finance, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W3169 Van Roy Road Suite 11, Appleton, WI 54915 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3925.17; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $58.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Appearance by Plaintiff's Attorney Cynthia Duppler by phone. No appearance by Defendant. Court grants default judgment in favor of Plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint on Monica Milan on 9/22/2021 / $ 58.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by private process; Additional Text: Money $3925.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 325679, Payable Number: 404331, Receipt Number: 21R 260404, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Note, Security Agreement & Arbitration Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Account Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schaefer, Emma N.