This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 19:47:58 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. DAKOTA HUBER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 MARINER FINANCE LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAKOTA HUBER. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1110

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE LLC

459 W Johnson St #D

Fond Du Lac, WI 54935

Defendant

HUBER, DAKOTA

Fox Lake, WI 53933

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lower, Austin J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Kartechner Brothers LLC, $4285.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 126177, Payable Number: 237152, Receipt Number: 21R 021686, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 126177, Payable Number: 237152, Receipt Number: 21R 021686, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115550, Payable Number: 236784, Receipt Number: 21R 020880, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC001110; Caption: MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. DAKOTA HUBER; Total Amount: $4138.44; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: DAKOTA HUBER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 110 MILL ST, Fox Lake, WI 53933 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MARINER FINANCE LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 459 W JOHNSON ST #D, Fond du Lac, WI 54935 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3871.94; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Court Reporter: Mountin, Maria; Additional Text: Attorney Austin J Lower in court for Plaintiff MARINER FINANCE LLC. Defendant DAKOTA HUBER not in court. Default judgment granted for amount requested plus applicable court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $3871.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 104344, Payable Number: 235461, Receipt Number: 21R 018539, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J