This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 00:03:16 (UTC).

MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. CYNTHIA OLSEN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 MARINER FINANCE LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYNTHIA OLSEN. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Resar, Chad. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1864

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Resar, Chad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINER FINANCE LLC

2272 W Mason St

Green Bay, WI 54303

Defendant

OLSEN, CYNTHIA

Pulaski, WI 54162

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lower, Austin J

Johnson, Joseph Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 016778, Payable Number: 325545, Receipt Number: 21R 022300, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021SC001864; Caption: MARINER FINANCE LLC vs. CYNTHIA OLSEN; Total Amount: $4144.9; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: CYNTHIA OLSEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 729 KARCZ DR #7, Pulaski, WI 54162 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: MARINER FINANCE LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2272 W MASON ST, Green Bay, WI 54303 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3878.4; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 02:49 PM Attorney Joseph Robert Johnson appeared by video means for Plaintiff MARINER FINANCE LLC. Defendant CYNTHIA OLSEN not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Cynthia Olsen to Chad Resar -routed to Commission Resar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011816, Payable Number: 321657, Receipt Number: 21R 015842, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 26, 2021 at 02:45 pm. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the Wisconsin Supreme Courts Order dated March 22, 2020 (amended April 15, 2020 and May 22, 2020) suspending in-person court hearings, THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE BY VIDEO AND TELEPHONE CONFERENCING DO NOT APPEAR IN PERSON. You may join this hearing by video using the following website: https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/99473400997?pwd=OVpkaFVnNnBaV0ZtVDE4cmEwUkV5dz09 (Meeting ID: 994 7340 0997/Password: 467141) or you may join this hearing by telephone by calling 1-312-626-6799 (Meeting ID: 994 7340 0997/Password: 467141). Please be advised that there are many cases scheduled on the Courts calendar during this time period so you may be required to remain in a Virtual Waiting Room until your case is called. Please be sure that your device has sufficient battery life for this possibility. This matter will not be adjourned by the court except upon formal motion for good cause or with specific approval of the court upon stipulation by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnson, Joseph Robert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J