This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/08/2022 at 12:07:04 (UTC).

Lynette Kay Wagner vs. Robin Pickney

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Lynette Kay Wagner filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Robin Pickney. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Ziegler, Todd L and Goodman, Mark L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0585

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Ziegler, Todd L

Goodman, Mark L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wagner, Lynette Kay

Tomah, WI 54660

Defendant

Pickney, Robin

Tomah, WI 54660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ returned satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MONROE; Case number: 2021SC000585; Caption: Lynette Kay Wagner vs. Robin Pickney; Total Amount: $623.08; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lynette Kay Wagner; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 28268 St Hwy 21, Tomah, WI 54660; Judgment Party; Party Name: Robin Pickney; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 28266 St HWY 21, Tomah, WI 54660; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $623.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: MONROE; Case number: 2021SC000585; Caption: Lynette Kay Wagner vs. Robin Pickney; Property/Remarks: Plaintiff is entitled to Restitution of the following premises: 28268 State Highway 21 Tomah, WI 54660; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lynette Kay Wagner; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 28268 St Hwy 21, Tomah, WI 54660; Judgment Party; Party Name: Robin Pickney; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 28266 St HWY 21, Tomah, WI 54660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21RG004616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Court Reporter: Griffin, Kathy J; Additional Text: Both parties present without counsel. Testimony heard. Plaintiff exhibits 1-25 offer and received by the court. Court grants eviction. Money judgment in the amount of $623.08 in favor of the plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: #1-Accounting of rent paid #2-Oakdale Electric bill #3-Oakdale Electric bill #4-Photo #5-Photo #6-Photo #7-Photo #8-Photo #9-Photo #10-Photo #11-Photo #12-Photo #13-Photo #14-Photo #15-Photo #16-Photo #17-Photo #18-Photo #19-Photo #20-Photo #21-Photo #22-Photo #23-Photo #24-Photo #25-Photo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on November 3, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Additional Text: Answer filed. Set for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: filed by Ms Wagner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition and Order for Waiver of Fees Granted for Wagner, Lynette Kay; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less