This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 12/11/2021 at 13:14:35 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Timothy Jeske

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Timothy Jeske. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1451

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Jeske, Timothy

Sheboygan, WI 53081-5763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014172, Payable Number: 359086, Receipt Number: 21R 021469, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001451; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Timothy Jeske; Total Amount: $1888.82; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Timothy Jeske; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1512 Union Ave, Sheboygan, WI 53081-5763 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1622.32; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $1622.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Court to ALL litigants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012769, Payable Number: 358064, Receipt Number: 21R 019515, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: attachment to complaint: Credit card statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E