This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 22:35:06 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Tarrie Moore

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tarrie Moore. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1324

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Moore, Tarrie

Sheboygan, WI 53081-7075

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014127, Payable Number: 359052, Receipt Number: 21R 021421, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: rcvd by CoC, sent to pltf atty 10-27-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001324; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Tarrie Moore; Total Amount: $1336.64; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tarrie Moore; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2332 Carmen Ave Apt 4A, Sheboygan, WI 53081-7075 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1070.14; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: 08:47 AM Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $1070.14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Court to ALL litigants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011608, Payable Number: 357041, Receipt Number: 21R 017371, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J