This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 01:48:01 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Steven Gilles

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven Gilles. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1926

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Gilles, Steven

Omro, WI 54963-1047

Garnishee

Oshkosh Corporation

2307 Oregon St, Attn Payroll

Oshkosh, WI 54902

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1559.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000041, Payable Number: 313011, Receipt Number: 22R 000048, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 561425, Payable Number: 308158, Receipt Number: 21R 029608, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 561431, Payable Number: 308168, Receipt Number: 21R 029622, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 561431, Payable Number: 308168, Receipt Number: 21R 029622, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC001926; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Steven Gilles; Total Amount: $1557.79; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Steven Gilles; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 421 Spruce St, Omro, WI 54963-1047 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1286.29; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $22.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2022-01-04; Type: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1559.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties. Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC and Attorney James E Kachelski not in court. Defendant Steven Gilles not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $1,286.29 / SAC mailed to DE via USPS on 08-24-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 451291, Payable Number: 306260, Receipt Number: 21R 026159, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E