This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 12:52:19 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Stacey Erickson

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stacey Erickson. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Iverson, Heather. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3419

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Iverson, Heather

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Erickson, Stacey

Kenosha, WI 53143

Garnishee

Country Veterinary Service

2007 S. Browns Lake Dr., Attn: Payroll

Burlington, WI 53105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 116750, Payable Number: 336135, Receipt Number: 22R 002727, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 116750, Payable Number: 336135, Receipt Number: 22R 002727, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 060200, Payable Number: 335806, Receipt Number: 22R 002298, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: KENOSHA; Case number: 2021SC003419; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Stacey Erickson; Total Amount: $955.6; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Stacey Erickson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 8024 14TH AVE UPPR, Kenosha, WI 53143 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $731.1; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $60.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Iverson, Heather; Additional Text: 02:58 PM Clerk: L.Konken PL appears by Atty James Kachelski. No appearance by the Defendant. Default money judgment entered plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Iverson, Heather

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons & Complaint was served upon Stacey Erickson on 01-08-2022 ($60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Iverson, Heather; Additional Text: $731.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 677999, Payable Number: 334407, Receipt Number: 21R 035238, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J