This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 12:38:20 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Samantha Arn

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Samantha Arn. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0534

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Arn, Samantha

Monroe, WI 53566-2526

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Stipulated Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order for Stipulated Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Order for Stipulated Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on January 24, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on January 3, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on December 6, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005136, Payable Number: 88406, Receipt Number: 21R 007930, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E