This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 16:38:29 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Moua Xiong

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Moua Xiong. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Wickler, Jody R and Bjerke, Todd W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1243

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Wickler, Jody R

Bjerke, Todd W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Xiong, Moua

Bangor, WI 54614-9117

Garnishee

Trane Technologies

800 E. Beaty St.

Davidson, NC 28036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000025, Payable Number: 189161, Receipt Number: 22R 000032, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000025, Payable Number: 189161, Receipt Number: 22R 000032, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008759, Payable Number: 187096, Receipt Number: 21R 014110, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001243; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Moua Xiong; Total Amount: $1029.96; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Moua Xiong; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W1842 State Highway 16, Bangor, WI 54614-9117 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $858.46; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: UNCONTESTED ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W; Additional Text: NO ANSWER FILED, DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007582, Payable Number: 186116, Receipt Number: 21R 012339, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J