This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 06:33:05 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Mary Youngblood

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary Youngblood. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0641

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Youngblood, Mary

Muskego, WI 53150-3744

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: Vacating Judgment signed by Commissioner Herring on 4-6-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Vacate judgment; Additional Text: Pursuant to the Order to Vacate Judgment signed by Commissioner Herring on 4-6-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Plaintiff's Attorney to Vacate Judgment, file by Atty Kachelski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Vacating Judgment, filed by Atty Kachelski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC000641; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Mary Youngblood; Total Amount: $919.59; Satisfaction: Other; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mary Youngblood; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: S72W12411 TESS CORNERS DR, Muskego, WI 53150-3744 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $715.09; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $40.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-04-06; Type: Vacate judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Service made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint; Electronic Filing Notice on Mary Youngblood

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 715.09 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Mary Youngblood Service as to: Mary Youngblood All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006336, Payable Number: 430025, Receipt Number: 21R 007396, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Filed on Mary Youngblood

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E