This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 13:12:16 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Linda Alberth

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Linda Alberth. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0894

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Alberth, Linda

Janesville, WI 53548

Garnishee

Mercy Health Syste

Janesville, WI 53548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Debtor: Linda Alberth, Garnishee: Mercy Health System, Creditor: LVNV Funding LLC, Unpaid Amount: $986.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 411965, Payable Number: 247539, Receipt Number: 21R 016850, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 411965, Payable Number: 247539, Receipt Number: 21R 016850, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 411889, Payable Number: 247474, Receipt Number: 21R 016735, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ROCK; Case number: 2021SC000894; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Linda Alberth; Total Amount: $986.11; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Linda Alberth; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 121 Madison St, Janesville, WI 53548 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $819.61; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 09:33 AM Attorney Jillian Walker for Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video means for Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC. Defendant Linda Alberth not in court. Judgment for Plaintiff, money: $819.61 plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Activity: Return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 5, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Linda Alberth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for money $819.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 328628, Payable Number: 245299, Receipt Number: 21R 012250, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Linda Alberth

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J