This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 01:13:40 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Jennifer Jennings

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Jennings. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1683

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Jennings, Jennifer

Oshkosh, WI 54901-4508

Garnishee

Omro Nursing & Rehab LLC

8170 Mccormick Blvd Suite 112, Attn Payroll

Skokie, IL 60076

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 451015, Payable Number: 305953, Receipt Number: 21R 025686, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 451015, Payable Number: 305953, Receipt Number: 21R 025686, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 450859, Payable Number: 305799, Receipt Number: 21R 025419, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021SC001683; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Jennifer Jennings; Total Amount: $1300.02; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jennifer Jennings; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 302 Fulton Ave, Oshkosh, WI 54901-4508 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1028.52; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $22.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.; Additional Text: Default judgment granted. NEJ/Judgment with FDS mailed to parties. Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC and Attorney Samuel J Olson not in court. Defendant Jennifer Jennings not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on August 11, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $1,028.52 / SAC mailed to DE via USPS on 07-15-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 394620, Payable Number: 303899, Receipt Number: 21R 021650, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J