This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 13:47:03 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Jannette Jeffords

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jannette Jeffords. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Giernoth, Sandra J and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1162

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Giernoth, Sandra J

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Jeffords, Jannette

Hartford, WI 53027-2124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for Dismissal and Acknowledgement and Waiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Giernoth, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Giernoth, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $60.0; Additional Text: personal service of Summons & Complaint on Jannette Jeffords on 12/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $1611.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 192607, Payable Number: 161785, Receipt Number: 21R 023055, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Jeffords_EX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J