This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 12:52:40 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Janice Phillips

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Janice Phillips. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3168

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Phillips, Janice

Janesville, WI 53546-9511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 172170, Payable Number: 261639, Receipt Number: 22R 003192, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ROCK; Case number: 2021SC003168; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Janice Phillips; Total Amount: $1111.91; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Janice Phillips; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6219 S US Highway 51 Lot 91, Janesville, WI 53546-9511 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $945.41; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 09:25 AM Attorney James Kachelski for Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video means for Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC. Defendant Janice Phillips not in court. Judgment for Plaintiff, money: $945.41 plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Additional Text: Activity: Return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on January 26, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Janice Phillips

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Amended Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Janice Phillips

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for money $945.41. *Amended Summons and Complaint to correct time of hearing*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 950741, Payable Number: 259766, Receipt Number: 21R 038792, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Credit One Bank Credit Card Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Janice Phillips

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J