This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 20:30:14 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. James Henry

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against James Henry. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1005

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Henry, James

Sheboygan, WI 53083-2762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment; Additional Text: Full Satisfaction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001120, Payable Number: 361266, Receipt Number: 22R 001665, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1043.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010395, Payable Number: 356147, Receipt Number: 21R 015743, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001005; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. James Henry; Total Amount: $1030.64; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: James Henry; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3003 N 26TH ST, Sheboygan, WI 53083-2762 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $864.14; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2022-01-28; Type: Full satisfaction; Amount: $1043.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $864.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Court to ALL litigants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008193, Payable Number: 354488, Receipt Number: 21R 012616, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E