This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 09:32:37 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Derek Severson

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Derek Severson. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, Troy L, Tews, Terrie and Vedral, Doreen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0213

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Tews, Terrie

Vedral, Doreen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Severson, Derek

Clintonville, WI 54929-9565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011698, Payable Number: 154354, Receipt Number: 21R 005233, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011698, Payable Number: 154354, Receipt Number: 21R 005233, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011688, Payable Number: 154293, Receipt Number: 21R 004962, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000213; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Derek Severson; Total Amount: $1347.51; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Derek Severson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N10088 HENN RD, Clintonville, WI 54929-9565 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1076.01; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: Atty. Kachelski appeared by letter. No appearance by defendant. Default judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007127, Payable Number: 153338, Receipt Number: 21R 003327, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E