This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 19:42:53 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Dawn Long

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dawn Long. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2529

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Long, Dawn

South Beloit, IL 61080-9210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Order for Dismissal without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Order to dismiss without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing returned; Additional Text: Notice of Hearing for Return Date November 17, 2021 at 9:00am- NOT FORWARDED, DISMISSED (Defendant Dawn Long)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Long, Dawn; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Dawn Long Current: 15243 Wittwer Rd, South Beloit, IL 61080-9210 United States (Effective: 10-25-2021) Prior: 937 1/2 Bluff St, Beloit, WI 53511-5164 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 17, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Summons & Complaint with Electronic Filing Notice for Return Date for November 17, 2021 at 9:00am *Unable to forward, resides outside of Rock County* (Defendant Dawn Long)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Dawn Long

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for money $2,631.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 831734, Payable Number: 256080, Receipt Number: 21R 032621, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Dawn Long

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Plaintiff's document: Fingerhut Account statement

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E