This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 17:42:11 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Cory Novachek

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cory Novachek. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kujak, Angela, Smith, Stacy A and Lowe, Lori J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0034

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kujak, Angela

Smith, Stacy A

Lowe, Lori J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Novachek, Cory

Elroy, WI 53929

Garnishee

CORY'S AUTO BODY

W10303 County Rd W, Attn Payroll

Elroy, WI 53929

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 029576, Payable Number: 125629, Receipt Number: 21R 002404, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Lowe, Lori J.; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for Novachek, Cory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009973, Payable Number: 124946, Receipt Number: 21R 001028, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009973, Payable Number: 124946, Receipt Number: 21R 001028, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000034; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Cory Novachek; Total Amount: $1463.61; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cory Novachek; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W10307 COUNTY ROAD W, Elroy, WI 53929 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1192.11; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-04-01; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Tape Recorder; Additional Text: 03:20 PM Attorney Samuel J Olson in court by letter for Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC. Defendant Cory Novachek not in court. COURT: Default Judgment plus statutory costs/attorney fees were granted to Plaintiff against Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 1-8-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Atty Olson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000122, Payable Number: 124505, Receipt Number: 21R 000166, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY OLSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: CORY NOVACHEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 1, 2021 at 12:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J