This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:13:00 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Christine Strossner

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christine Strossner. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kreuser, Jacalyn A, Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr and Potter, Gregory J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0276

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr

Potter, Gregory J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive, Ste 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Strossner, Christine

Arpin, WI 54410-9604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 02:50 PM Attorney James E Kachelski not in court. Defendant Christine Strossner appeared by phone means. The Plaintiff does not appear so the motion is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: 07/06/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion to reopen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: to Reopen Small Claims Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Potter, Gregory J.; Additional Text: to Reopen Small Claims Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Denied as plaintiff failed to appear and no good cause was shown within 20 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Plaintiff failed to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 02:15 PM Attorney James E Kachelski not in court. Defendant Christine Strossner in court. Based on non appearance by the plaintiff matter to be dismissed in 20 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Potter, Gregory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 01:43 PM Attorney Luke Weiland in court for Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC. Defendant Christine Strossner not in court. Matter adjourned for 30 days. Defendant is working with Financial Solution. Return date scheduled for May 25, 2021 at 01:00 pm. Return date scheduled for May 25, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 25, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $60.0; Additional Text: 03/25/2021; Christine Strossner; S&C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $621.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002862, Payable Number: 125158, Receipt Number: 21R 002592, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E