This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 06:47:52 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Candee Warren

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Candee Warren. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1574

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Warren, Candee

Sheboygan, WI 53083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: Mail returned undeliverable prior to return date Case dismissed due to lack of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: re: S&C to Candee Warren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014175, Payable Number: 359090, Receipt Number: 21R 021474, Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Warren, Candee; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Candee Warren Current: 1128A GEELE AVE # A, Sheboygan, WI 53083 (Effective: 11-12-2021) Prior: 919 N 5th St Apt 7, Sheboygan, WI 53081-4168 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: re: S&C to Candee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $1533.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Court to ALL litigants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 013905, Payable Number: 358893, Receipt Number: 21R 021008, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: attachment to complaint: Credit card statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E