This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/08/2022 at 19:54:51 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Benjamin Tierney

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Benjamin Tierney. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0600

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Tierney, Benjamin

Boscobel, WI 53805-1625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000673, Payable Number: 149800, Receipt Number: 22R 000947, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000673, Payable Number: 149800, Receipt Number: 22R 000947, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008701, Payable Number: 149007, Receipt Number: 21R 011463, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000600; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Benjamin Tierney; Total Amount: $1421.62; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Benjamin Tierney; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 109 MARY ST, Boscobel, WI 53805-1625 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1150.12; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: No appearance by parties. Court grants default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007443, Payable Number: 148190, Receipt Number: 21R 009946, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J