This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 00:52:26 (UTC).

Little Blessings Learning Center vs. Tom Freeland

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Little Blessings Learning Center filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tom Freeland. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Beer, James R, Phillipson, Faun Marie and Jorgenson, Duane M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0291

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Beer, James R

Phillipson, Faun Marie

Jorgenson, Duane M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Little Blessings Learning Center

512 2Nd Street

Hudson, WI 54016

Defendant

Freeland, Tom

Brodhead, WI 53520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Koehler, Arnold R

Defendant Attorney

Knoke, Gregory E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Court Reporter: Harding, Toni; Additional Text: 10:31 AM Plaintiff Little Blessings Learning Center appeared by video means by Attorney Fletcher. Attorney Knoke does not appear. PL has recieved payment waiting for the check to clear. Plaintiff will file a dismissal. Matter set over for status. Status conference scheduled for February 11, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 11, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Court Reporter: Harding, Toni; Additional Text: 09:35 AM Attorney Christopher Fletcher appeared by phone means for Plaintiff Little Blessings Learning Center. Defendant Tom Freeland not in court. Attorney Gregory E Knoke not in court. Attorney Fletcher states there has been an agreement, waiting on payment. Matter set over. Status conference scheduled for January 7, 2022 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 7, 2022 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Jorgenson, Duane M.; Court Reporter: Harding, Toni; Additional Text: 10:38 AM Attorney Gregory E Knoke appeared by video means for Defendant Tom Freeland. AttorneyChristopher Fletcher appeared by video means for Plaintiff Little Blessings Learning Center. Attorney Knoke would like to have the matter set over. Serttlement documents have been exchanged. Status conference scheduled for December 17, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion to reopen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Beer, James R.; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: 10:00 AM Attorney Arnold R Koehler not in court. Defendant Tom Freeland appeared by video means. Court dismisses on DEs motion - for PLs failure to prosecute. 10:29 a.m. end of calendar call - PL was present with no audio. Court instructs PL can file a motion to reopen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Beer, James R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Freeland, Tom; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Tom Freeland Current: 302 - 6th Street, Brodhead, WI 53520 United States (Effective: 06-08-2021) Prior: 507 6th St, Brodhead, WI 53520 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Beer, James R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002512, Payable Number: 86132, Receipt Number: 21R 004047, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Beer, James R.; Additional Text: Declaration of Nonmilitary-Tom Freeland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 21, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knoke, Gregory E