This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 10:44:27 (UTC).

LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN vs. ANGELINA R MARTIN

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELINA R MARTIN. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bitney, J. M, Amy Pavick and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0451

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bitney, J. M

Amy Pavick

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN

2476 S. Main St

Rice Lake, WI 54868

Defendant

MARTIN, ANGELINA R

Hayward, WI 54843

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 007248

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000451; Caption: LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN vs. ANGELINA R MARTIN; Total Amount: $512.83; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Make: Ashley Model #: 8390438 Serial #: S526814580 Description: Stat.Sofa ***Components: 2 Accent Pillows Make: Ashley Model #: 8390435 Serial #: S526815189 Description: Stat.Loveseat ***Components: 2 Accent Pillows Make: Ashley Model #: T113-13 Serial #: 682800170343 Description: Coffee/Ends ***Components: 1 Coffee Table, 2 End Tables Make: Ashley Model #: L100644 Serial #: 695340843296 Description: Lamps ***Components: 1 Lamp, 1 Shade, 1 Harp, 1 Finial Make: Ashley Model #: L100644 Serial #: 695340823589 Description: Lamps ***Components: 1 Lamp, 1 Shade, 1 Harp, 1 Finial Make: Ashley Model #: R240002 Serial #: 801001295773 Description: Rug; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANGELINA R MARTIN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 13226 BACON SQUARE, Hayward, WI 54843 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2476 S. MAIN ST, RICE LAKE, WI 54868 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $318.33; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-06; Type: Transcript issued; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-20; Type: Writ of replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Court Reporter: Schaaf, Karen; Additional Text: 09:43 AM Defendant ANGELINA R MARTIN not in court. Plaintiff LEBAKKENS INC OF WI DBA LEBAKKENS RENT TO OWN not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 08/11/2021 SERVICE OF THE FOLLOWING ON ANGELINA MARTIN: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, ELECTRONIC FILING NOTICE, DECLARATION OF NONMILITARY SERVICE; SMALL CLAIMS PROCEDDURES; ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to plaintiff with attachments to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 050901, Payable Number: 122429, Receipt Number: 21RP001763, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less