This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 15:35:02 (UTC).

Koble Investments, LLC vs. Nathaniel Macon and Quisheena Thompson

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Koble Investments, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Nathaniel Macon and Quisheena Thompson. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Gregory and Ley, Amanda J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1669

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Gregory

Ley, Amanda J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Koble Investments, LLC

224770 Zinnia Dr

Wausau, WI 54401

Defendants

Macon, Nathaniel

Wausau, WI 54403

Thompson, Quisheena

Wausau, WI 54403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: on Nathaniel Macon w/OFD - Not Deliverable as Addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: on Quisheena Thompson w/OFD - Not Deliverable as Addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Damage hearing; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: Koble Investments does not appear. Nathaniel Macon does not appear. Quisheen Thompson does not appear. Case dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of writ; Additional Text: Sheriff's Report to the Court - Writ executed on 11-15-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 017342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: MARATHON; Case number: 2021SC001669; Caption: Koble Investments, LLC vs. Nathaniel Macon and Quisheena Thompson; Judgment Party; Party Name: Koble Investments, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 224770 Zinnia Dr, Wausau, WI 54401 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nathaniel Macon; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 500 E Thomas St Apt 304, Wausau, WI 54403 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Quisheena Thompson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 500 E Thomas St Apt 304, Wausau, WI 54403 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: Case called 9:00 time block in Courtroom A. Clerk: Becca Koble Investments LLC appears. Nathaniel Macon appears. Quisheena Thompson does not appear. Judgment for eviction for Nathaniel. Default JU for eviction for Quisheena. DHE set.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Damage hearing on December 16, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Quisheena Thompson on 10-12-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Nathaniel Macon on 10-12-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by sheriff; Additional Text: Copies to Pltf for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 175450, Payable Number: 268495, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Notice to Quit or Pay Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Nathaniel Macon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Quisheena Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less