This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/10/2022 at 11:13:34 (UTC).

Koble Investments, LLC vs. Javon Ware

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Koble Investments, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Javon Ware. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Wolf, Todd P, Weymouth, Richard and Kreuser, Jacalyn A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0999

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Wolf, Todd P

Weymouth, Richard

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Koble Investments, LLC

224770 Zinnia Dr

Wausau, WI 54401

Defendant

Ware, Javon

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Damage hearing; Court Official: Weymouth, Richard; Location: Reserve Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: from Kolbe to adjourn to prepare damage list.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000999; Caption: Koble Investments, LLC vs. Javon Ware; Property/Remarks: Defendant to vacate premises by 12/30/21 at 5:00 pm 2821 Boles St Apt 26, WRW 54495; Judgment Party; Party Name: Koble Investments, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 224770 Zinnia Dr, Wausau, WI 54401 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Javon Ware; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2821 Boles St Apt 26, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 01:15 PM Plaintiff Koble Investments, LLC in court. Defendant Javon Ware in court. Defendant contests this matter and it will be sent to the Judge Wolf. Eviction hearing scheduled for December 14, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction hearing; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P; Court Reporter: Zamow, Denise; Additional Text: 02:42 PM Plaintiff Koble Investments, LLC in court, by Nick Brock, Manager. Defendant Javon Ware in court. He is looking for an eviction due to non-compliance. Nick Brock is sworn as a witness. He states the lease is month-to-month. Mr. Brock states that he is seeking eviction based on Wisconsin Stats. 704.07(4) and 704.17(b). He states that defenant was given a 5-day notice and 14-day notice. The apartment complex needed to be sprayed for insect infestation. The exterminator attempted to spray on 9/22/21 and 10/6/21. The apartment was not able to be sprayed because the cupboards were not cleaned out. Anthony Lueck appears by phone and is sworn. He states he is the owner of Kill All Pest Control. He states that apartment #26 was not cleared out so he was not able to spray. Javon Ware is sworn as a witness. He states he did comply with the rules for clearing out the apartment so they could spray. He said the maintenance man said that everything was okay to spray. Court grants eviction. Must vacate premises by 12/30/21 at 5:00 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Damage hearing on February 2, 2022 at 01:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 11/23/21; Javon Ware; S&C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $28.33; Additional Text: 2821 Boles St Apt 26, WRW 54495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 011085, Payable Number: 130532, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: 14 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less