This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 12:22:40 (UTC).

Kathleen S Englund vs. Jeff Kirkland et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Kathleen S Englund filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jeff Kirkland. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Yackel, John M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0120

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Yackel, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Englund, Kathleen S

Cambridge, MN 55008

Defendants

Kirkland, Jeff

Winter, WI 54896

Kirkland, Dawn

Winter, WI 54896

Plaza Services, LLC

10 Hammond Dr, Suite 110

Atlanta, GA 30328

Midland Credit Management, Inc

350 Camino De La Reina, Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Treeland Cottages, Inc

9630 N Treeland Rd

Hayward, WI 54843

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelsey, Michael Arthur

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003508, Payable Number: 68817, Receipt Number: 21R 006504, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Foreclosure; County: SAWYER; Case number: 2021CV000120; Caption: Kathleen S Englund vs. Jeff Kirkland et al; Total Amount: $5.0; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kathleen S Englund; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1165 Joes Lake Rd SE, Cambridge, MN 55008; Judgment Party; Party Name: Dawn Kirkland; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5103 N Main St, Winter, WI 54896; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jeff Kirkland; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5103 N Main St, Winter, WI 54896; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Court Reporter: Biskup, Candace; Additional Text: 10:35 AM Court calls case and recites appearances. Attorney Michael Arthur Kelsey in court for Plaintiff Kathleen S Englund. No other appearances. Atty Kelsey makes brief record. Based upon review of file and record made today, Court grants judgment in the amount of $ 31,127.32 and electronically signs FFCL and Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after motion; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: E file notice sent to Plaza Services returned from 10 Hammond Dr Suite 110 - Atlanta GA 30328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: of Plaza Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Jeff Kirkland and Dawn Kirkland (substitute service) by Process Server T Donovan on 9/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $265.5; Additional Text: 21R 004961

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002645, Payable Number: 68024, Receipt Number: 21R 004966, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey, Michael Arthur