This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2022 at 19:27:28 (UTC).

Karen Crooks vs. Carl Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Karen Crooks filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Carl Anderson. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Ziegler, Todd L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0168

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Ziegler, Todd L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crooks, Karen

Sparta, WI 54656

Defendants

Anderson, Carl

Sparta, WI 54656

Anderson, Joan

Sparta, WI 54656

Fischer, Christopher

Sparta, WI 54656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buswell, Jack D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavits of Service - Carl Anderson, Joan Anderson, Christopher Fischer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on April 21, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Court Reporter: Griffin, Kathy J; Additional Text: Answer filed. Set for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Carl Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Christopher Fischer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Joan Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001868, Payable Number: 160352, Receipt Number: 21RT001044, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Eviction Certification

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Buswell, Jack D