This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 05:03:41 (UTC).

Julie Buss vs. Steven Dane et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Julie Buss filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Steven Dane. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Snow, Kristine A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0365

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Snow, Kristine A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buss, Julie

West Bend, WI 53095

Defendants

Dane, Steven

Berlin, WI 54923

American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

8040 Excelsior Drive, Suite 400, C/O Corp Svc Co-Reg Agent

Madison, WI 53717

Glenroy, Inc. Employee Health Plan

W158 N9332 Norxway Avenue

Menomonee Falls, WI 53051

BlueCross BlueShield of WI dba Anthem BlueCross & BlueShield

301 S. Bedford Street, Suite 1, C/O Ct Corporation System

Madison, WI 53703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrykus, Daniel Paul

Defendant Attorneys

Robison, Brandon Jon

McKenzie, Megan

Larson, Andrew Louis

Paider, Katelyn Evalise

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final pre-trial; Court Official: Snow, Kristine A.; Location: Circuit Court Branch 4; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Judge Snow filing Dr. Eric Gaenslen's Medical Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: Dr. Eric Gaenslen's Medical Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: American Family and Steven Dane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Substitution of attorney; Additional Text: Notice of Substitution of Attorneys - American Family and Steven Dane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 115471, Payable Number: 236622, Receipt Number: 21R 020667, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Snow, Kristine A.; Additional Text: Case management and scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling data sheet; Additional Text: Defendants Scheduling Conference Data Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: American Family Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Clerk filing Affidavits of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Steven Dane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Glenroy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Blue Cross Blue Shield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: Response to Complaint by Steven Dane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 082462, Payable Number: 233191, Receipt Number: 21R 014273, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Cover letter to Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larson, Andrew Louis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robison, Brandon Jon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKenzie, Megan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paider, Katelyn Evalise