This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 01/22/2022 at 23:33:02 (UTC).

Joseph Dolata et al vs. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Joseph Dolata filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Zuidmulder, Donald R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0495

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Zuidmulder, Donald R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dolata, Joseph

Green Bay, WI 54313

Dolata, Deborah

Green Bay, WI 54313

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

Hoida, Logan

Oneida, WI 54155

Not Yet Classified

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

1900 South 18Th Avenue

West Bend, WI 53095

Dean Health Plan, Inc.

1277 Deming Way

Madison, WI 53717

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janssen, Robert John

Defendant Attorney

Fuehrer, Erik L.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Johannes, Kaitlyn J

Miller, Dan Kurtes

Fassbender, Frederick J

Stock-Retzloff, Jamie

Conlin, Shannon Ashley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial - 12 person; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 3rd Floor, Room 360; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial - 12 person; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 3rd Floor, Room 360; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial - 12 person; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 3rd Floor, Room 360; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 3rd Floor, Room 360; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Additional Text: Civil Scheduling Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on September 20, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Jury trial - 12 person on October 10, 2022 at 08:15 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Defendants, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and Logan Hoida's, Scheduling Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Zuidmulder, Donald R.; Additional Text: for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: Demand for 6 Person Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Retainer - Erik L. Fuehrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014703, Payable Number: 324013, Receipt Number: 21R 019845, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Retainer - Kaitlyn J Johannes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and crossclaim; Additional Text: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company's Answer, Counterclaim and Cross-Claim, and Answer to All Present and Future Claims and Cross-Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012000, Payable Number: 321846, Receipt Number: 21R 016198, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fassbender, Frederick J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Dan Kurtes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conlin, Shannon Ashley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stock-Retzloff, Jamie