This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 22:07:02 (UTC).

Johnson Managment, LLC vs. Jacob Smith et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Johnson Managment, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jacob Smith. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0435

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson Managment, LLC

970 Union Street

Platteville, WI 53818

Defendants

Smith, Jacob

Platteville, WI 53818

Smith, Jordan

Platteville, WI 53818

Davis, Caitlyn

Platteville, WI 53818

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: Plaintiff Darby Shea-Kruser appears on behalf of plaintiff. Defendant's Jacob & Caitlyn appear in person, Jordan does not appear. Plaintff requests eviction as parties have no paid rent. Defendants heard and state they are unemployed. Court heard & grants judgment of eviciton and money claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000435; Caption: Johnson Managment, LLC vs. Jacob Smith et al; Total Amount: $1522.42; Judgment Party; Party Name: Caitlyn Davis; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Johnson Managment, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 970 Union Street, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jacob Smith; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street Upper, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jordan Smith; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street Upper, Platteville, WI 53818; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1340.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $87.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000435; Caption: Johnson Managment, LLC vs. Jacob Smith et al; Property/Remarks: Eviction is granted for property located at 770 Lancaster Street Upper, Platteville, WI 53818.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Caitlyn Davis; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Johnson Managment, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 970 Union Street, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jacob Smith; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street Upper, Platteville, WI 53818; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jordan Smith; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 770 Lancaster Street Upper, Platteville, WI 53818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less