This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 06:11:45 (UTC).

John R. Quigley vs. City of Lake Mills

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 John R Quigley filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against City of Lake Mills. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Weber, Jennifer and Brantmeier, Bennett J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0322

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Weber, Jennifer

Brantmeier, Bennett J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quigley, John R.

Deerfield, WI 53531

Defendant

City of Lake Mills

200 Water St.

Lake Mills, WI 53551

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Drescher, Daniel A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.; Additional Text: granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss {pc Pltf 8/26/21}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: re: 8/13/21 hearing (Atty Drescher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Oral arguments; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.; Court Reporter: Taylor, Sandra; Additional Text: [KS] case called at 9:29am (Pltf's Request for De Novo Review of Def's Motion to Dismiss) Plaintiff John R. Quigley in court. Attorney Daniel A. Drescher in court for Defendant City of Lake Mills. Court reviews case filings, Commissioner's Dismissal and Mr. Quigley's letter filed. Motion to Dismiss: Arguments presented by Atty Drescher. Arguments presented by Mr. Quigley. The Court states there is a procedure provided by the legislature, cites WIS STATS 893.80, presents basis, and grants the Motion to Dismiss, stating the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Atty Drescher to submit proposed order. The Court further explains his ruling. recess 9:45am NEXT: Atty Drescher to submit proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: of John Quigley re case and argument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Return of COC mail intended for John R. Quigley. Re-mailed to updated address. (CM/7-22-21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Clerk removes the previously entered 7/12/21 code for Dismissal, as a Demand for Trial was filed on 7/6/21 and a hearing is set before the Judge on 8/13/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Quigley, John R.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for John R. Quigley Current: PO Box 301, Deerfield, WI 53531 United States (Effective: 07-19-2021) Prior: 2 S. Main St. #4, Deerfield, WI 53531 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Return of COC mail intended for Pltf. Address updated. re-mailed. (ks/7-19-21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Oral arguments on August 13, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Small Claims Pretrial Orders and General Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Hearing on June 29, 2021 at 01:00 pm. [This Notice of Hearing was mailed to the Plaintiff, along with the Zoom instructions, the Pretrial Orders & General Information, and the Representing Yourself in Court form. MK]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086474, Payable Number: 181071, Receipt Number: 21R 006963, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Atty Drescher for Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: City of Lake Mills was served (S&C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $936.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 005988

    Read MoreRead Less